Trustees WHITWICK AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1181238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Ealing Johnson | Chair | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Katherine Johnson | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Collier | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Flecher | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Janet Robb | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Read | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ann Gwinnutt | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.