Trustees LEUKAEMIA CARE
Charity number: 1183890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Ranulph George Matthews-Maxwell | Chair | 01 February 1999 |
|
|||||
Helen Knight | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mhairi Copland | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Ann Smith | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carina Patterson | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dharmesh Mehta | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Heppell | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Wilson | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Stallard | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emmanouil Nikolousis | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane DAVIES | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.