Trustees ST MARGARET'S HOUSE CHARITY, LEE
Charity number: 1184455
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TIMOTHY GOODE | Chair | 02 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Nakessa Morgan | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Marion Barbara Scott | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
WINIFRED DORIS KIRKMAN KIRKMAN | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin James Shore Quinnell | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE CHEESEBOROUGH | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.