Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS AND ST PAUL WITH ST THOMAS THE MARTYR, OXFORD
Charity number: 1185150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Woods MA BTh | Chair | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Dagenhart Culpepper | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zakia Alhareth | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pui Man Leung | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pownall | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Rushworth | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Matthew Salisbury | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Pittaway | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Birte Feix | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Pittaway | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mary Boulton | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hodby | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul South | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Atkins | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hanneke Wilson | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Coyne-Barr | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Herbertson | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SUSAN GILLINGHAM | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.