Governing document SPECIAL NEEDS IMPROVEMENT PROJECTS SWANSEA
Charity number: 514504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 1983 AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 1983,15 MARCH 1989, 3 APRIL 1990 AND 27 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY USING SPECIAL NEEDS SERVICES IN SWANSEA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY,AND BY PROMOTING AND ASSISTING THE WORK OF THE SERVICES IN ANY CHARITABLE WAY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.