Governing document ACTION FOR SPORT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 2019 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 FEB 2020 as amended on 12 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: · TO PREVENT OF RELIEVE THE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SPORTS KIT AND EQUIPMENT TO CHILDREN LIVING IN POVERTY IN THE UK TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. · TO ADVANCE AMATEUR SPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SPORTS KIT AND EQUIPMENT TO CHILDREN LIVING IN POVERTY IN THE UK TO ENABLE PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES · FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTION OF RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF RECYCLED SPORTS KIT AND EQUIPMENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.