Trustees THE ARKWRIGHT SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 515526
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Rivers CBE | Chair | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paula Holt MBE | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Dawson | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Phipps | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Clare Feely | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
NEIL RIDDLE | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bishop | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rawlings | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
WENDY TRACEY | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Duncan Lewins | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Atkinson | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.