Trustees HASTINGS INTERNATIONAL PIANO
Charity number: 1192703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Helena Kowitz | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Norman Charles Strickland | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Stevens | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Diahann Brown | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alistair Keith | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer Yeo MBE | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Lam | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Marten | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Richard Wray | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.