Trustees WIGAN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 521705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Alfred Davies | Chair | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Morrell | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Norman Finch | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eric Joseph Walter | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Thompson | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CONNELLAN | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|||||
LEWIS WILLIAM FOSTER | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL JANE PICTON | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN THOMPSON | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY SEAN PICTON | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GREEN | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEWART THOMPSON | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joan Smith | Trustee | 13 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BILSBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ANN ASPINALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN HAYTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALLAN FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.