Trustees SHEFFIELD FEDERATION FOR SCHOOL SPORTS
Charity number: 523931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Moran | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pat Howse | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Raynes | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Beare | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG MALKIN | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER MCLEOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.