Trustees STAFFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL STAFFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 524528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Austin Preston | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hill Sharon Hill | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Anne Smith | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Brass | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rafferty | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hordern | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN LEA HEWITT | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN HEWITT | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICK LLOYD | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIET MAIDEN | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM SMITH | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND SMITH | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hinson | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|||||
PAUL ASKEY | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR K LOW | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.