Trustees 1ST HALESOWEN SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 524625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Mark Timmins | Chair | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Gill | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Victoria Price | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Ann Marie Guy | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Sinclair | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Case | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Taylor | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Betteridge | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gail White | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne McCann | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Timmins | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Sankey | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH LINDSEY REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MARTIN DALE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.