Trustees JOHN MARTIN'S CHARITY
Charity number: 527473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Westlake | Chair | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Albert Patrick Booth | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Marion Winifred Mary Griffiths | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN WILSON | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart Allerton | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Valerie Butler | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Cyril Clayton Scorse | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sherraden Adelle Murphy | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN HYDE SMITH OBE | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Ellis Osborne | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Philip William Airdrie | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev MARK BINNEY | Trustee | 13 March 2008 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.