Trustees MORETON HALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 528409
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Maud Elizabeth Clacher | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Carryer | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Hincks | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Angela Jones | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Gillian Foulger | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Leonard Stockdale | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JEREMY JOHN DIXEY | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Eithne Josephine Flynn | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAURA VIRGINIA YULE | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR MARTYN HEATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET TUNSTALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATIE NEILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.