Governing document HIGHFIELD PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1985, 10 NOVEMBER 1988, 26 NOVEMBER 1992, 1 DECEMBER 1998, 28 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 19 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT AND CARRY ON SCHOOLS IN WHICH THEY MAY RECEIVE A SOUND GENERAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE PRESTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.