Trustees MUSIC FOR ALL
Charity number: 1055371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ishani Jenny Bhasara O'Connor | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faye Deidre McGuinness | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Ladbrook | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Paul Followell | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jill Shevlin | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cullen | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Saunders | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Charles Booth | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Toomey | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.