Trustees WORLD OBESITY FEDERATION
Charity number: 1076981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Dieter Kent Buse PhD | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Parks PhD | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amber Huett-Garcia | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ogweno Stephen Odhiambo | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ada Cuevas | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kyoung-Kon Kim | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Barquera Cervera | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JASON HALFORD | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bruno Halpern | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADAM JAMES MCCORMACK | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LOUISE BAUR | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CAROLINE APOVIAN | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN WILDING | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KARINE CLEMENT | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr DONNA RYAN | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.