Trustees LILIAN FAITHFULL CARE
Charity number: 1122183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Spencer | Chair | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Greg Watts | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eve Suzanne Russell Russell | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Morgan Morgan | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elizabeth Harding | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dame Janet Trotter DBE CVO | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Pratt | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Court | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Smith | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bishop | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARETH PARRY | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.