Trustees ASSOCIATION FOR LEARNING TECHNOLOGY
Charity number: 1160039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen O'Sullivan | Chair | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Puiyin Wong | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Hopkins | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shonagh Douglas | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David White | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Smyth | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Lafferty | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Flynn | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bryant | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.