Trustees THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Charity number: 212992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Daffey | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Grimshaw | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christy Farrer | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward Hill | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Kaushik Roy | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adthisaya Ganesen Manickam | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Langford Shaw | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Stephen John de Mora | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yves Joseph Guy De Leeneer | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francis Byrne Mungo | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hodge | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sajid Hussain | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Fischbacher | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Parviz Sangin | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Nicholls-Lee | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MURPHY | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.