Trustees DORSET SEARCH & RESCUE (DORSAR)
Charity number: 1121658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Andrew Slough | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Nicholas Goodhand | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Elliott Vivian Hixson-Ward | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mace | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Guinevere Sutton | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leslie Shelton | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Adams | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR ANTELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.