THE COMMONWEALTH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1078736
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH MARCH 1999 AMENDED 23RD JULY 2003 AND 8 DECEMBER 2005, 27 JANUARY 2006 AND 19 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THE COMMONWEALTH; AND (B) TO PROMOTE INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE IN THE COMMONWEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR, THE PROMOTION OF EXHIBITIONS AND INFORMATION SERVICES, WHETHER PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY, ILLUSTRATING ALL OR ANY ASPECTS OF THE COMMONWEALTH AND THE LIFE OF ITS PEOPLES.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 23 December 1999 : registered
  • 17 November 2015 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services