CHRISTIAN UNION ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1101143-6
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 22 MAR 1968 AS AMENDED ON 07 FEB 1980 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 14 JAN 1993 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO PROFESS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 60 AND 75 YEARS
Area of benefit
BRENT, CAMDEN, KENSINGTON & CHELSEA & CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of