SOUTHAMPTON AND WINCHESTER VISITORS GROUP

Charity number: 1103093
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 2003 AND AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 2003, 8 MARCH 2004 , 3 JULY 2006 AND 4 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AMONGST REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND OTHER IMMIGRANTS BY PROVIDING SUCH CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, IN MATTERS SUCH AS MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE, BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 06 April 2004 : registered
  • 07 November 2020 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (INCOR))
Other names
  • WINCHESTER VISITORS GROUP FOR REFUGEES (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helped
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information