CROSS KEYS HOMES LIMITED

Charity number: 1104746
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1) PROVIDE HOUSES, SOCIAL HOUSING OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4) PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 5) RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 6) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 7) MAINTAIN, IMPROVE OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 02 July 2004 : registered
  • 22 September 2018 : removed (EXEMPT CHARITY)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information