WEAVER VALE HOUSING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1105813
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 APR 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 3.2 TO PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATES AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.3 TO PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF ANY PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.4 TO PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 3.5 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 3.6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.7 TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 09 September 2004 : registered
  • 19 July 2018 : removed (EXEMPT CHARITY)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information