SAXON WEALD HOMES LIMITED

Charity number: 1114158
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/11/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE (A) TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING, OTHER HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, SERVICES AND AMENITIES FOR POOR PEOPLE AND FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY OR LEARNING DISABLED) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; AND (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT PROHIBITED FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED WITH THE REGULATOR AS A PRIVATE REGISTERED PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 11 May 2006 : registered
  • 18 April 2019 : removed (EXEMPT CHARITY)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services