JJ VAN MARS

Charity number: 1152872
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/07/2013 as amended on 31 May 2019
Charitable objects
To help and care for young people, so as to develop their capabilities that they grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society, especially but not exclusively those in need by reason of neglect, abuse, homelessness, financial disadvantage or addiction. In furtherance of this the charity may acquire property and apply that property for the purposes named above, especially but not exclusively by way of drop-in-centres to provide a range of facilities including but not limited to those of education, art, sport, drama, music, psychotherapy, care and accommodation. In addition the charity may make grants to other registered charities who fulfil these objects either directly or indirectly through the provision of grants in support of similar activities.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 15 July 2013 : registered
  • 05 November 2020 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (GI))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space