THE ROYAL DRAMATIC COLLEGE PENSION FUND

Charity number: 206524-3
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 29 MARCH 1878 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 23 JANUARY 1968, AND 14 OCTOBER 1999. UNITING DIRECTION OF THE COMMISSIONERS 17 FEBRUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PEOPLE, WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE DRAMATIC PROFESSION FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS AND CANNOT MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BECAUSE OF AGE AND ILL HEALTH OR THE WIDOWS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN GI
Registration history
  • 17 February 2003: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of