THOMAS MARSHALL

Charity number: 220316-12
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 2 JULY 1886 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 31 JULY 1896, 27 AUGUST 1907 AND 17 JULY 1956.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF LONGDON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LONGDON.
Registration history
  • 19 October 1964: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of