Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THOMAS WOODWARD (ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES)
Charity number: 235904-5
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 11 MARCH 1952 AND 24 JUNE 1971, AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 1996 PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF BIRLINGHAM
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BIRLINGTON
Registration history
- 12 August 1964: Standard registration
- 13 March 1996: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.