Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SLOUGH ST PAUL 2ND CURACY ENDOWMENT
Charity Number: 244700-87
Removed charity
Governing document
COMMITTEE MINUTE 20TH JUNE 1940 AS AMENDED ON 27 AUGUST 1993 AND 31 AUGUST 1993 BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION43(2)A AND SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992.
Charitable objects
TOWARDS STIPEND OF 2ND CURATE AT ST. PAUL'S SLOUGH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 27 September 1965: Standard registration
- 24 September 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.