Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CHARLES BROOKE
Charity number: 246487-6
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29 APRIL 1881 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 15 DECEMBER 1893. AS AMENDED ON 26 JUNE 1996 BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF DODWORTH.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF DODWORTH
Registration history
- 21 January 1966: Standard registration
- 26 February 2000: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.