Register of Charities - The Charity Commission OFFICERS' MESS FUND (INCLUDING THE SUBSIDIARY OF CAPTAIN THOMAS DONALD)
Charity number: 248969-3
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 12 NOVEMBER 1954, AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 10 DECEMBER 1971, 27 JUNE 1979 AND 12 OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
19. APPLICATION OF INCOME, ETC. - SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENTS AFORESAID THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL AS AND WHEN THEY THINK FIT APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE WHOLE OF ANY PART OF THE INCOME, CASH AND INVESTMENTS OF THE FUNDED CHARITIES FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN THE TERRITORIAL AND ARMY VOLUNTEER RESERVE UNITS OF THE ROYAL ANGLIACN REGIMENT WITH HEADQUARTERS IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE. PROVIDED THAT IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSES AFRESAID THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APLIED THE SAME IN ASSISTING PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN EITHER OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED COMPANIES OR INTHE FORMER NORTHAMPTONSHIE REGIMENT (AND ESPECIALLY IN THE FORMER 3RD (MILITIA) BATTALION OF THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE REGIMENT) AND THEIR DEPENDENTS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) MAY MAKE GRANTS TO THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE REGIMENT COMRADES' ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 12 August 1966: Standard registration
- 10 March 2003: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 10 March 2003: Funds transferred to 248996 48TH/58TH FOOT THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE REGIMENTAL TRU...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.