Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOHN WARD
Charity Number: 252168-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 1 SEPTEMBER 1879 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 25 APRIL 1972 AND 25 MAY 1976
Charitable objects
1/3 OF INCOME SHALL BE APPLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY WAY OF SCHOOLSHIP, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE OR GRANT TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEANING OR TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION. (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFIT, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS AND BOOKS TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING ON LEAVING UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (2) RESIDUE OF THE CHARITY'S INCOME SHALL BE APPLY IN RELIEVEING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY. (3) PROVISION OR RECREATION FACILITIES FOR THE RESIDENT OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLD
Registration history
- 22 April 1967: Standard registration
- 05 December 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.