DAME HENRIETTA BARNETT FUND

Charity number: 252204
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 3RD JANUARY 1939 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 21ST NOVEMBER 1997 AS AFFECTED BY ORDER OF 7TH APRIL 2004 AND RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES EFFECTIVE AS OF 7TH APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OR THE BETTERMENT OR THE POORER CLASSES AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 22 May 1967 : registered
  • 23 March 2017 : removed (FUNDS SPENT UP (S.75))
Other names
  • DAME HB FUND (Working name)
  • DAME HENRIETTA BARNETT TRUST FUND (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations