FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN WITH LEUKAEMIA

Charity number: 298405-1
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH JANUARY 1988; AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10TH DECEMBER 2003. (AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF, A CURE FOR, AND TREATMENT OF LEUKAEMIA IN CHILDREN PROVIDED THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH PUBLISHED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Registration history
  • 06 January 1988: Standard registration
  • 21 August 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 21 August 2008: Funds transferred to 298405 CHILDREN WITH CANCER UK
  • 27 October 2011: Funds received from 298077 SIMON COHEN MEMORIAL TRUST
Other names
  • CHILDREN WITH LEUKAEMIA (Working name)
  • CHILDREN WITH LEUKAEMIA (Previous name)
  • CHILDREN WITH LEUKAEMIA UK (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of