Register of Charities - The Charity Commission RACHEL MANSFIELD MEMORIAL
Charity number: 303327-5
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17.08.1914 AND SCHEMES OF 21.10.1949 AND 31.10.1983
Charitable objects
IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING A HOLIDAY OR HOLIDAYS FOR ONE OR MORE WORKING GIRLS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF A CLUB AFFILIATED TO THE LONDON UNION OF MIXED CLUBS AND GIRLS' CLUBS
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Registration history
- 05 June 1962: Standard registration
- 24 September 1992: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.