HENRY LONSDALE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 508840
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 10/04/1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/08/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/10/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF NEEDY ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS; (A) BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HOME OR HOMES FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS. (B) BY THE PROVISION OF DAY AND RESPITE CARE CENTRES FOR ELDERLY PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS. (C) BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SERVICES FOR ELDERLY PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS WHO REQUIRE THOSE SERVICES OR ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF THEIR AGE AND LIMITATION OF MEANS.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 06 July 1979 : registered
  • 05 October 2020 : removed (AMALGAMATED)
Other names
  • THE HENRY LONSDALE TRUST (Working name)
What the charity did
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helped
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services