Register of Charities - The Charity Commission MICHAEL HILL MEMORIAL PRIZES
Charity number: 527284-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1952 AND SCHEME OF 5 SEPTEMBER 1966, AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 31 JANURAY 1972, 15 SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO AWARD A PRIZE OR PRIZES FOR PROFICIENCY AMONGST THE STUDENTS AT THE R.A.F. COLLEGE, CRANWELL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 11 July 1967: Standard registration
- 28 August 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.