Accounts and annual returns Royston Old Barn

Charity number: 1000035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window