Financial history Royston Old Barn

Charity number: 1000035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.09k £26.86k £28.31k £32.44k £36.97k
Total expenditure £28.00k £27.80k £28.02k £28.80k £20.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.81k £10.91k £10.81k N/A £36.69k