JILL FRANKLIN TRUST

Charity number: 1000175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 07 September 2017 On time Download