JILL FRANKLIN TRUST

Charity number: 1000175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £80.91k £214.80k £82.12k £101.19k £89.02k
Total expenditure £83.28k £211.84k £79.89k £93.19k £107.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A