Accounts and annual returns THE ELIZABETH JANE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1000258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 March 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window