ST ANTHOLIN'S LECTURESHIP CHARITY

Charity number: 1000308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £1.00k £1.02k £1.05k £1.08k £1.11k
Total expenditure £250 £312 £362 £1.05k £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A