WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED

Charity number: 1000378
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)