WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED

Charity number: 1000378
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.20k £30.71k N/A £16.84k
Other income £719.67k £580.95k £565.54k £1.11m £694.01k
Total expenditure £526.74k £562.75k £741.53k £618.23k £733.45k