WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED

Charity Number: 1000378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public in the history and development of railway locomotion by the preservation of railway locomotives and/or rolling stock and/or historic railway lines

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • W & L L R (Working name)
  • WELSHPOOL & LLANFAIR RAILWAY (Working name)
  • WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR STEVE CLEWS Chair
THE SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
HERITAGE RAIL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Anne-Marie Wright Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
Ryk Parkinson Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
Peter Anthony Green Trustee 09 August 2020
None on record
Helen Margaret Ashby Trustee 26 October 2017
THE FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM
Received: 93 days late
THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM
Received: On time
ROBERT ANDREW ROBINSON Trustee 30 May 2015
WELSHPOOL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Received: On time
ROBERT ANDREW MASON Trustee 31 May 2014
None on record
Andrew George Charman Trustee 13 June 2012
None on record
DAVID RICHARD JONES Trustee
HANES CELTICA CYF
Received: On time
SIMON JOHN BOWDEN Trustee
None on record
JOHN FORMAN Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR IAIN SINCLAIR MCLEAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £710.85k £587.02k £1.51m £1.21m £968.29k
Total expenditure £733.45k £557.56k £925.59k £953.32k £1.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.84k £109.19k £363.06k £673 £7.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £227.88k £311.20k £1.05m £634.46k £204.89k
Income - Other trading activities £161.80k £30.66k £84.24k £153.80k £242.54k
Income - Charitable activities £311.43k £92.14k £369.52k £409.33k £469.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.75k £7.83k £7.58k £17.39k £51.81k
Income - Other £0 £145.19k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £89.00k £56.83k £580.30k £535.27k £78.73k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £587.84k £513.20k £925.59k £811.84k £820.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £141.49k £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.76k £3.13k £20.22k £10.56k £3.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £145.62k £44.36k £0 £0 £256.45k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.46m £1.52m £1.51m £1.56m £1.55m
Long-term investments £238.00k £254.00k £289.00k £256.00k £304.00k
Other assets £705.57k £839.92k £1.29m £1.47m £1.40m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £105.22k £269.53k £127.96k £100.07k £141.08k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Welshpool & Llanfair Light Railway
Llanfair Station
Pool Road
Llanfair Caereinion
WELSHPOOL
Powys
Phone:
01938810441