WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED

Charity number: 1000378
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Arall DAVID RICHARD JONES Trustee
HANES CELTICA CYF Charity reporting is up to date
ROBERT ANDREW ROBINSON Trustee 30 May 2015
WELSHPOOL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT Charity reporting is up to date
Peter Anthony Green Trustee 09 August 2020 None on record
William David Bickers-Jones Trustee 09 August 2020
THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM Charity reporting is up to date
PROFESSOR IAIN SINCLAIR MCLEAN Trustee
THE CHERWELL SINGERS Charity reporting is up to date
MR STEVE CLEWS Chair None on record
ANDREW GEORGE CHARMAN Trustee 13 June 2012 None on record
HELEN MARGARET ASHBY OBE BA FMA Trustee 26 October 2017
THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM Charity reporting is up to date
1ST ACOMB (YORK) BOYS' BRIGADE Charity reporting is up to date
ROBERT ANDREW MASON Trustee 31 May 2014 None on record
Oliver Edwards Trustee 04 November 2019 None on record
SIMON JOHN BOWDEN Trustee None on record
JOHN FORMAN Trustee None on record